IA HF2424 | 2011-2012 | 84th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 1 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-19 - Referred to Judiciary. H.J. 582.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-19 - Referred to Judiciary. H.J. 582.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to county attorney duties when representing the department of human services in juvenile court. (Formerly HF 608) (Formerly HSB 88)
Title
A bill for an act relating to county attorney duties when representing the department of human services in juvenile court. (Formerly HF 608) (Formerly HSB 88)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-19 | Referred to Judiciary. H.J. 582. | |
2012-03-12 | Fiscal note. HCS. | |
2012-03-08 | Amendment H-8144 filed. H.J. 493. | |
2012-03-01 | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 401. |