IA HF2400 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 773.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 773.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to contracts and payments for dental care service plans. (Formerly HSB 638.) Effective date: 07/01/2024.
Title
A bill for an act relating to contracts and payments for dental care service plans. (Formerly HSB 638.) Effective date: 07/01/2024.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-26 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 773. |
2024-04-10 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 772. |
2024-02-26 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 385. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 386. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 46, nays 0. S.J. 385. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Substituted for SF 2384. S.J. 385. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Read first time, attached to SF 2384. S.J. 342. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 342. |
2024-02-19 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 316. |
2024-03-04 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 495. |
2024-02-22 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 380. |
2024-02-20 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 337. |
2024-02-20 | House | Explanations of votes. H.J. 336. |
2024-02-20 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 335. |
2024-02-19 | House | Passed House, yeas 91, nays 0. H.J. 305. |
2024-02-19 | House | Amendment H-8008 adopted. H.J. 305. |
2024-02-15 | House | Amendment H-8008 filed. H.J. 287. |
2024-02-08 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 226. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB638 (Related) 2024-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2400.
SSB3137 (Related) 2024-02-14 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2384.
SF2384 (Similar To) 2024-02-26 - Withdrawn. S.J. 386.
SSB3137 (Related) 2024-02-14 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2384.
SF2384 (Similar To) 2024-02-26 - Withdrawn. S.J. 386.