IA HSB638 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2400
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2384
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2384
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2400.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2400.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to contracts and payments for dental care service plans.(See HF 2400.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to contracts and payments for dental care service plans.(See HF 2400.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-08 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2400. |
2024-02-06 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 217. |
2024-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 2-0. |
2024-01-31 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/01/2024 11:00AM RM 103, Sup. Ct. Chamber. |
2024-01-30 | House | Subcommittee: Mohr, G., Sorensen and Srinivas. H.J. 161. |
2024-01-30 | House | Introduced, referred to Commerce. H.J. 159. |
2024-01-30 | House | By COMMITTEE ON COMMERCE |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3137 (Related) 2024-02-14 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2384.
HF2400 (Replaced by) 2024-04-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 773.
SF2384 (Replaced by) 2024-02-26 - Withdrawn. S.J. 386.
HF2400 (Replaced by) 2024-04-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 773.
SF2384 (Replaced by) 2024-02-26 - Withdrawn. S.J. 386.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HSB638 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HSB638.html |