IA HF2312 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-14 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-14 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to testing violent crime evidence collection kits by the state criminalistics laboratory. (Formerly HSB 617.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to testing violent crime evidence collection kits by the state criminalistics laboratory. (Formerly HSB 617.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-14 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Subcommittee: Dawson, Kinney, and Schultz. S.J. 650. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 621. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 621. |
2018-03-08 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 548. |
2018-03-08 | House | Passed House, ayes 98 nays none. H.J. 536. |
2018-02-12 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 251. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB617 (Related) 2018-02-07 - Subcommittee recommends passage.