IA HF2265 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Withdrawn. H.J. 441.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Withdrawn. H.J. 441.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the admissibility of evidence of an employee’s criminal history in civil actions. (See HF 2397.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the admissibility of evidence of an employee’s criminal history in civil actions. (See HF 2397.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 441. |
2018-02-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2018-02-08 | House | Subcommittee: Hinson, Jones and Lensing. H.J. 240. |
2018-02-06 | House | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 214. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2397 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Senate amendment H-8383 filed. H.J. 804.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HF2265 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/HouseFiles/Introduced/HF2265.html |