IA HF2397 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-17 - Senate amendment H-8383 filed. H.J. 804.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-17 - Senate amendment H-8383 filed. H.J. 804.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the admissibility of evidence of an employee’s criminal history in civil actions. (Formerly HF 2265.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the admissibility of evidence of an employee’s criminal history in civil actions. (Formerly HF 2265.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | House | Senate amendment H-8383 filed. H.J. 804. |
2018-04-17 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 791. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 945. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 46, nays 3. S.J. 944. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Amendment S-5167 out of order. S.J. 944. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Amendment S-5247 adopted, as amended. S.J. 944. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Amendment S-5249 to S-5247 filed, adopted. S.J. 944. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Amendment S-5247 filed. S.J. 944. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Amendment S-5242 filed, withdrawn. S.J. 944. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 752. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Amendment S-5167 filed. S.J. 726. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 679. |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Subcommittee: Dawson, Boulton, and Zaun. S.J. 592. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 502. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 502. |
2018-03-01 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 441. |
2018-03-05 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 460. |
2018-03-01 | House | Passed House, ayes 95 nays 1. H.J. 438. |
2018-03-01 | House | Amendment H-8151 withdrawn. H.J. 437. |
2018-02-28 | House | Amendment H-8151 filed. H.J. 431. |
2018-02-19 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 294. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2265 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Withdrawn. H.J. 441.