IA HF2171 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 901.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 901.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the release of nursing facility reimbursement rates under the Medicaid program. (Formerly HSB 554.) Effective date: 07/01/2022.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the release of nursing facility reimbursement rates under the Medicaid program. (Formerly HSB 554.) Effective date: 07/01/2022.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-19 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 901. |
2022-05-23 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 901. |
2022-04-21 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 850. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 799. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0. S.J. 797. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Substituted for SF 2258. S.J. 797. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 552. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Read first time, attached to companion SF 2258. S.J. 373. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 373. |
2022-02-22 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 345. |
2022-02-22 | House | Passed House, yeas 95, nays 0. H.J. 333. |
2022-01-31 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 148. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB554 (Related) 2022-01-31 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2171.
SF2258 (Similar To) 2022-04-19 - Withdrawn. S.J. 798.
SF2258 (Similar To) 2022-04-19 - Withdrawn. S.J. 798.