IA SF2258 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-19 - Withdrawn. S.J. 798.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-19 - Withdrawn. S.J. 798.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the release of nursing facility reimbursement rates under the Medicaid program.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the release of nursing facility reimbursement rates under the Medicaid program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate Human Resources Report (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 798. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | HF 2171 substituted. S.J. 797. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 552. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Attached to companion HF 2171. S.J. 373. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 325. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/15/2022 12:00PM Room G15. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Subcommittee: Costello, Green, and Ragan. S.J. 278. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Human Resources. S.J. 262. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB554 (Related) 2022-01-31 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2171.
HF2171 (Similar To) 2022-05-23 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 901.
HF2171 (Similar To) 2022-05-23 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 901.