IA HF204 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/13/2019 10:30AM House Lounge.
Pending: House Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/13/2019 10:30AM House Lounge.
Pending: House Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to continuity of care and nonmedical switching by health carriers, health benefit plans, and utilization review organizations, and including applicability provisions.
Title
A bill for an act relating to continuity of care and nonmedical switching by health carriers, health benefit plans, and utilization review organizations, and including applicability provisions.
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Moore [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-11 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/13/2019 10:30AM House Lounge. |
2019-02-04 | House | Subcommittee: Moore, T., Brink and Derry. H.J. 205. |
2019-02-04 | House | Introduced, referred to Human Resources. H.J. 199. |
Same As/Similar To
SF292 (Similar To) 2019-03-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 489. S.J. 488.
SF489 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - Subcommittee: Carlin, Jochum, and Sweeney. S.J. 108.
SF489 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - Subcommittee: Carlin, Jochum, and Sweeney. S.J. 108.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF204 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF204.html |