IA SF292 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-06 - Reported out of committee as SF 489. S.J. 488.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to continuity of care and nonmedical switching by health carriers, health benefit plans, and utilization review organizations, and including applicability provisions. (See SF 489.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to continuity of care and nonmedical switching by health carriers, health benefit plans, and utilization review organizations, and including applicability provisions. (See SF 489.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-06SenateReported out of committee as SF 489. S.J. 488.
2019-02-20SenateSubcommittee: Greene, Edler, and Jochum. S.J. 362.
2019-02-18SenateIntroduced, referred to Human Resources. S.J. 327.

Same As/Similar To

HF204 (Similar To) 2019-02-11 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/13/2019 10:30AM House Lounge.
SF489 (Similar To) 2019-04-04 - Referred to Human Resources. S.J. 858.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback