IA SF489 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-16 - Subcommittee: Carlin, Jochum, and Sweeney. S.J. 108.
Pending: Senate Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-16 - Subcommittee: Carlin, Jochum, and Sweeney. S.J. 108.
Pending: Senate Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to continuity of care for covered persons with epilepsy, and nonmedical switching by health carriers, health benefit plans, and utilization review organizations, and including applicability provisions. (Formerly SF 292.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to continuity of care for covered persons with epilepsy, and nonmedical switching by health carriers, health benefit plans, and utilization review organizations, and including applicability provisions. (Formerly SF 292.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-16 | Senate | Subcommittee: Carlin, Jochum, and Sweeney. S.J. 108. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Human Resources. S.J. 858. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 488. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 480. |
Same As/Similar To
HF204 (Similar To) 2019-02-11 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/13/2019 10:30AM House Lounge.
SF292 (Similar To) 2019-03-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 489. S.J. 488.
SF292 (Similar To) 2019-03-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 489. S.J. 488.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF489 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF489.html |