IA HF192 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-09 - Withdrawn. H.J. 596.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-09 - Withdrawn. H.J. 596.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act establishing a scenic byways enhancement fund, including by providing for voluntary contributions to the fund, and including effective date provisions.(Formerly HSB 87; See HF 345.)
Title
A bill for an act establishing a scenic byways enhancement fund, including by providing for voluntary contributions to the fund, and including effective date provisions.(Formerly HSB 87; See HF 345.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-09 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 596. |
2023-02-20 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 345. |
2023-02-15 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 359. |
2023-02-15 | House | Fiscal note. |
2023-02-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. |
2023-02-08 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/13/2023 12:15PM House Lounge. |
2023-02-06 | House | Subcommittee: Bossman, Bergan and Zabner. H.J. 249. |
2023-02-06 | House | Introduced, referred to Appropriations. H.J. 245. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1031 (Related) 2023-01-26 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 151.
HSB87 (Related) 2023-02-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 192.
SF151 (Similar To) 2023-02-02 - Tabled until future meeting. [].
HF345 (Similar To) 2023-03-20 - Subcommittee: Zumbach, Koelker, and T. Taylor. S.J. 633.
HSB87 (Related) 2023-02-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 192.
SF151 (Similar To) 2023-02-02 - Tabled until future meeting. [].
HF345 (Similar To) 2023-03-20 - Subcommittee: Zumbach, Koelker, and T. Taylor. S.J. 633.