AZ HB2767 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Transmit to House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Transmit to House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Emergency management assistance; reimbursement
Title
Emergency management assistance; reimbursement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - Senate - Senate Military Affairs, Public Safety and Border Security Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - Senate - Senate Military Affairs, Public Safety and Border Security Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | House | Transmit to House |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate MAPS Committee |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2024-02-27 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (57-0-2-0) |
2024-02-20 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-20 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-19 | House | House consent calendar |
2024-02-19 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0) |
2024-02-14 | House | House GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-08 | House | House read second time |
2024-02-06 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Assigned to House GOV Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Definitions (s)
Emergency Management Assistance (s)
Emergency Management Assistance Compact (s)
Emergency Management Assistance Compact And Arizona Mutual Aid Compact Revolving Fund (s)
Exemption (s)
Federally Recognized Indian Tribe (s)
Military Affairs And Emergency Management - Title 26 (s)
Purpose (s)
Reimbursement (s)
Emergency Management Assistance (s)
Emergency Management Assistance Compact (s)
Emergency Management Assistance Compact And Arizona Mutual Aid Compact Revolving Fund (s)
Exemption (s)
Federally Recognized Indian Tribe (s)
Military Affairs And Emergency Management - Title 26 (s)
Purpose (s)
Reimbursement (s)