IA HSB87 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly

Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 192.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act establishing a scenic byways enhancement fund, including by providing for voluntary contributions to the fund, and including effective date provisions.(See HF 192, HF 345.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act establishing a scenic byways enhancement fund, including by providing for voluntary contributions to the fund, and including effective date provisions.(See HF 192, HF 345.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-06HouseCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 192.
2023-02-01HouseCommittee report, recommending passage. H.J. 231.
2023-01-26HouseSubcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0.
2023-01-25HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 01/26/2023 12:00PM RM 19.
2023-01-25HouseSubcommittee: Henderson, Kressig and Siegrist. H.J. 188.
2023-01-25HouseIntroduced, referred to Transportation. H.J. 185.
2023-01-25HouseBy COMMITTEE ON TRANSPORTATION

Same As/Similar To

SSB1031 (Related) 2023-01-26 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 151.
SF151 (Replaced by) 2023-02-02 - Tabled until future meeting. [].
HF192 (Replaced by) 2023-03-09 - Withdrawn. H.J. 596.
HF345 (Replaced by) 2023-03-20 - Subcommittee: Zumbach, Koelker, and T. Taylor. S.J. 633.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback