IA SSB1031 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-26 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 151.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-26 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 151.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act establishing a scenic byways enhancement fund, including by providing for voluntary contributions to the fund, and including effective date provisions.(See SF 151.)
Title
A bill for an act establishing a scenic byways enhancement fund, including by providing for voluntary contributions to the fund, and including effective date provisions.(See SF 151.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-26 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 151. |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Subcommittee reassigned: Klimesh, Koelker, and Taylor, T. |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/19/2023 12:00PM Room G15. |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Subcommittee: Klimesh, Koelker, and Winckler. |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Transportation. |
2023-01-12 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
HSB87 (Related) 2023-02-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 192.
SF151 (Replaced by) 2023-02-02 - Tabled until future meeting. [].
HF192 (Replaced by) 2023-03-09 - Withdrawn. H.J. 596.
HF345 (Replaced by) 2023-03-20 - Subcommittee: Zumbach, Koelker, and T. Taylor. S.J. 633.
SF151 (Replaced by) 2023-02-02 - Tabled until future meeting. [].
HF192 (Replaced by) 2023-03-09 - Withdrawn. H.J. 596.
HF345 (Replaced by) 2023-03-20 - Subcommittee: Zumbach, Koelker, and T. Taylor. S.J. 633.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SSB1031 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SSB1031.html |