HI SR97 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Mayor And Council Of The City And County Of Honolulu To Honor "general" John H. Rogers, Jr., For Dedicated Service To Our Country.
Title
Honoring "General" John Rogers for Humanitarian Efforts
Sponsors
Sen. Sam Slom [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-07 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-04-09 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-11-13. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Reported from PSM/TEC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1410) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Green. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TEC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Tokuda. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/TEC has scheduled a public hearing on 04-04-13 1:15PM in conference room 414. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Referred to PSM/TEC. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=97&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/SR97_.HTM |