HI SR92 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-28 - The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-28 - The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Land And Natural Resources And The Sand Island Business Association To Negotiate An Even, Fair, And Equitable Exchange Of Sand Island Industrial Park Land That Would Allow Sand Island Businesses To Remain On Their Leased Parcels.
Title
Sand Island Industrial Park; Land Exchange
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-28 | Senate | The committee on WTL deferred the measure. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | The committee on EGH deferred the measure. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/EGH deferred the measure until 03-28-13 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | The committee on WTL has deleted the measure from decision making scheduled on 03-28-13 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL deferred the measure until 03-28-13 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/EGH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-13 10:45AM in conference room 225. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Referred to WTL/EGH, WAM. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=92&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/SR92_.HTM |