HI SR85 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SR85
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Honolulu Police Department To Open A Police Station On Oahu's North Shore.
Title
Urging The Honolulu Police Department To Open A Police Station On Oahu's North Shore.
Sponsors
Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] |
Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] | Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-29-18. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3248) with recommendation of adoption. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Baker, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-18 1:45PM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Referred to PSM. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR85 (Carry Over) 2017-05-30 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17.
HR75 (Same As) 2018-03-28 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
HR75 (Same As) 2018-03-28 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=85&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SR85_.HTM |