HI SR82 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SR82
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The President Of The United States To Issue A Presidential Directive Ordering Federal Agencies To Report Disaggregated Native Hawaiian And Pacific Islander Data In Compliance With The Office Of Management And Budget Statistical Policy Directive No. 15.
Title
Urging The President Of The United States To Issue A Presidential Directive Ordering Federal Agencies To Report Disaggregated Native Hawaiian And Pacific Islander Data In Compliance With The Office Of Management And Budget Statistical Policy Directive No. 15.
Sponsors
Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
Sen. Bennette Misalucha [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-24 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-06 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-05-22. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Reported from HWN/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3656) with recommendation of adoption. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Baker, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite, Fevella. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HWN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Acasio, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fevella. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-24-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred to HWN/PSM. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR82 (Carry Over) 2021-03-16 - Referred to HTH/HMS/EDU.
SCR92 (Same As) 2022-04-06 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 45
SCR92 (Same As) 2022-04-06 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 45