HI SCR92 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR92
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-06 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 45
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-06 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 45
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The President Of The United States To Issue A Presidential Directive Ordering Federal Agencies To Report Disaggregated Native Hawaiian And Pacific Islander Data In Compliance With The Office Of Management And Budget Statistical Policy Directive No. 15.
Title
Urging The President Of The United States To Issue A Presidential Directive Ordering Federal Agencies To Report Disaggregated Native Hawaiian And Pacific Islander Data In Compliance With The Office Of Management And Budget Statistical Policy Directive No. 15.
Sponsors
Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
Sen. Bennette Misalucha [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-24 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-06 | House | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 45 |
2022-04-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 621). |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-05-22. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Reported from HWN/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3655) with recommendation of adoption. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Baker, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite, Fevella. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HWN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Acasio, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fevella. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-24-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred to HWN/PSM. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR92 (Carry Over) 2021-04-08 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
SR82 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
SR82 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.