HI SR81 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SR81
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Retail Merchants Of Hawaii To Establish A Policy To Prohibit Supplies Purchased During Emergencies From Being Returned To Stores.
Title
Urging The Retail Merchants Of Hawaii To Establish A Policy To Prohibit Supplies Purchased During Emergencies From Being Returned To Stores.
Sponsors
Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice. |
2020-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-20 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Referred to CPH, JDC. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR81 (Carry Over) 2019-03-27 - Report adopted, referred to JDC/WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=81&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SR81_.HTM |