HI SR75 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR75
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declaring June 27 Of Each Year As Post-traumatic Stress Injury Awareness Day And Designating The Month Of June Of Each Year As Post-traumatic Stress Injury Awareness Month In Hawaii.
Title
Declaring June 27 Of Each Year As Post-traumatic Stress Injury Awareness Day And Designating The Month Of June Of Each Year As Post-traumatic Stress Injury Awareness Month In Hawaii.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-03-19. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1701) with recommendation of adoption. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) J.Keohokalole. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-19 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Referred to LCA/CPH. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR75 (Carry Over) 2019-04-03 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
HR190 (Same As) 2019-03-27 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Holt, McKelvey excused (4).
HR190 (Same As) 2019-03-27 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Holt, McKelvey excused (4).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=75&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SR75_.HTM |