HI SR73 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SR73
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-02 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-02 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Legislative Reference Bureau To Submit A Report To The Legislature On All Current State Gun Control Laws, How They Compare With Current Federal Regulations, Data On Firearm Discharges, And Data On Gun Crime In Hawaii.
Title
Requesting The Legislative Reference Bureau To Submit A Report To The Legislature On All Current State Gun Control Laws, How They Compare With Current Federal Regulations, Data On Firearm Discharges, And Data On Gun Crime In Hawaii.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-02 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. |
2018-03-29 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-02-18. |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Reported from PSM/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3345) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-18 2:00PM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Referred to PSM/JDC. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR73 (Carry Over) 2017-03-16 - Referred to HWN/CPH/PSM.