HI SR7 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR7
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-17 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-17 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Hawaii State Commission On The Status Of Women To Convene A Task Force To Study Missing And Murdered Native Hawaiian Women And Girls.
Title
Requesting The Hawaii State Commission On The Status Of Women To Convene A Task Force To Study Missing And Murdered Native Hawaiian Women And Girls.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 290), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to JDC. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Keohokalole, Acasio, Ihara, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-21 1:00PM in conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Referred to HWN, JDC. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR7 (Carry Over) 2021-02-17 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
HR12 (Same As) 2021-03-31 - Resolution adopted in final form.
SCR8 (Same As) 2021-03-30 - Referred to HHH, JHA, referral sheet 30
HR12 (Same As) 2021-03-31 - Resolution adopted in final form.
SCR8 (Same As) 2021-03-30 - Referred to HHH, JHA, referral sheet 30
Subjects
Hawaii State Commission on the Status of Women
Missing
Murdered
Native Hawaiian Women and Girls
Study
Task Force
Missing
Murdered
Native Hawaiian Women and Girls
Study
Task Force