HI SR7 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SR7
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - Report and Resolution Adopted. Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Gabbard. Noes, 0 (none).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - Report and Resolution Adopted. Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Gabbard. Noes, 0 (none).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Congressional Delegation Of Hawaii And The United States Congress To Oppose "concealed Carry Reciprocity" Legislation.
Title
Requesting The Congressional Delegation Of Hawaii And The United States Congress To Oppose "concealed Carry Reciprocity" Legislation.
Sponsors
Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Laura Thielen [D] |
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-05 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Gabbard. Noes, 0 (none). |
2018-04-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-05-18. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3400) with recommendation of adoption. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, K. Rhoads, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Gabbard ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-18 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to JDC. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3046), with recommendation of referral to JDC. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. |
2018-03-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-08-18 1:30PM in conference room 229. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR7 (Carry Over) 2017-01-30 - Referred to CPH, WAM.
HR29 (Same As) 2018-03-23 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HR29 (Same As) 2018-03-23 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=7&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SR7_.HTM |