HI SR63 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR63
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Education To Use Coronavirus Aid, Relief, And Economic Security Act And Coronavirus Response And Relief Supplemental Appropriations Act Monies To Retain Teachers And Prevent Furloughs.
Title
Urging The Department Of Education To Use Coronavirus Aid, Relief, And Economic Security Act And Coronavirus Response And Relief Supplemental Appropriations Act Monies To Retain Teachers And Prevent Furloughs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-21 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-29-21. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1271) with recommendation of adoption. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-21 3:20PM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to EDU. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR63 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
SCR83 (Same As) 2021-04-01 - Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 31
SCR83 (Same As) 2021-04-01 - Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 31