HI SR6 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SR6
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Hawaii Broadband And Digital Equity Office To Prioritize Access To Broadband Services In Rural Areas Throughout The State.
Title
Urging The Hawaii Broadband And Digital Equity Office To Prioritize Access To Broadband Services In Rural Areas Throughout The State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-06 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-04-05 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-06-22. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3702) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Misalucha, Lee, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 03-30-22 3:20PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Referred to EET. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR6 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
SCR12 (Same As) 2022-04-18 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno, Woodson excused (2).
SCR12 (Same As) 2022-04-18 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno, Woodson excused (2).