HI SR51 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR51
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Hawaii Emergency Management Agency To Develop An Evacuation Plan For The Areas Within Lava Zones 1, 2, 3, 4, And 6.
Title
Requesting The Hawaii Emergency Management Agency To Develop An Evacuation Plan For The Areas Within Lava Zones 1, 2, 3, 4, And 6.
Sponsors
Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Laura Acasio [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-21 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-31-21. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1327) with recommendation of adoption. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Baker, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-21 1:10PM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred to PSM. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR51 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
SCR69 (Same As) 2021-04-08 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
SCR69 (Same As) 2021-04-08 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).