HI SCR69 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR69
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-08 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-08 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Hawaii Emergency Management Agency To Develop An Evacuation Plan For The Areas Within Lava Zones 1, 2, 3, 4, And 6.
Title
Requesting The Hawaii Emergency Management Agency To Develop An Evacuation Plan For The Areas Within Lava Zones 1, 2, 3, 4, And 6.
Sponsors
Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Laura Acasio [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - House - House Pandemic & Disaster Preparedness: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-08 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). |
2021-04-08 | House | Reported from PDP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1739), recommending referral to FIN. |
2021-04-06 | House | The committees on PDP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Eli, Cullen, Mizuno, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Yamashita, Ward. |
2021-04-01 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by PDP on Tuesday, 04-06-21 10:30AM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2021-04-01 | House | Referred to PDP, FIN, referral sheet 32 |
2021-03-31 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 508). |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-31-21. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1326) with recommendation of adoption. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Baker, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-21 1:10PM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred to PSM. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR69 (Carry Over) 2021-04-08 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
SR51 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
SR51 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.