HI SR49 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SR49
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Establishment Of A Working Group To Examine How The Department Of Education Can Maximize Medicaid Reimbursement For Support Services Offered To Eligible Students During School Hours.
Title
Requesting The Establishment Of A Working Group To Examine How The Department Of Education Can Maximize Medicaid Reimbursement For Support Services Offered To Eligible Students During School Hours.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Reported from EDU/HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3298), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Espero, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Dela Cruz. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, S. Chang, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Tokuda. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU/HMS added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 03-23-18 2:55PM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Referred to EDU/HMS, WAM. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR49 (Carry Over) 2017-03-16 - Referred to GVO/PSM/TRE, WAM.
HR86 (Same As) 2018-03-13 - Referred to EDN/HHS, FIN, referral sheet 39
HR86 (Same As) 2018-03-13 - Referred to EDN/HHS, FIN, referral sheet 39