HI SR48 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SR48
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Kim.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Kim.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Hawaii Chapter Of The American Judicature Society And The Hawaii State Bar Association To Analyze And Assess The Role Of The Judiciary Within The Constitutional Framework Of Government In The State Of Hawaii.
Title
Urging The Hawaii Chapter Of The American Judicature Society And The Hawaii State Bar Association To Analyze And Assess The Role Of The Judiciary Within The Constitutional Framework Of Government In The State Of Hawaii.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Kim. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 04-23-18 9:45AM in conference room 016. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR48 (Carry Over) 2017-03-16 - Referred to IAA/JDL, WAM.
HR21 (Same As) 2018-03-08 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HR21 (Same As) 2018-03-08 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=48&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SR48_.HTM |