HI SR42 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SR42
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-19 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-19 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging All Policymakers And Residents Of The City And County Of Honolulu To Support The Waianae Sustainable Communities Plan And The Preservation Of Ohikilolo.
Title
Urging All Policymakers And Residents Of The City And County Of Honolulu To Support The Waianae Sustainable Communities Plan And The Preservation Of Ohikilolo.
Sponsors
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] |
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-19 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. |
2018-04-18 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-19-18. |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3785) with recommendation of adoption. |
2018-04-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, K. Rhoads, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kim, L. Thielen. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 04-13-18 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Reported from HWN/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3416), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to JDC. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Galuteria, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Green. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Inouye, Riviere, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-18 1:15PM in conference room 016. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Re-Referred to HWN/WTL, JDC. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Referred to HWN, JDC. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR42 (Carry Over) 2017-03-29 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
HR150 (Same As) 2018-03-13 - Referred to OMH, JUD, referral sheet 39
HR150 (Same As) 2018-03-13 - Referred to OMH, JUD, referral sheet 39