HI SR40 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SR40
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-14 - Referred to AEN, WAM.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-14 - Referred to AEN, WAM.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Agriculture To Establish A Kauai Invasive Species Task Force To Study The Issues Of Invasive Animals In Kauai.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Agriculture To Establish A Kauai Invasive Species Task Force To Study The Issues Of Invasive Animals In Kauai.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-14 | Senate | Referred to AEN, WAM. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR40 (Carry Over) 2017-05-30 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17.
HR60 (Same As) 2018-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HR60 (Same As) 2018-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=40&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SR40_.HTM |