HI HR60 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HR60
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Agriculture To Establish A Kauai Invasive Species Task Force To Study The Issues Of Invasive Animals In Kauai.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Agriculture To Establish A Kauai Invasive Species Task Force To Study The Issues Of Invasive Animals In Kauai.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2018-04-04 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Choy, Fukumoto, Holt, C. Lee, McKelvey excused (5). |
2018-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1762-18), recommending adoption. |
2018-04-03 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Tupola, Ward. |
2018-03-29 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-03-18 10:05AM in conference room 308. |
2018-03-28 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1). |
2018-03-28 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1524-18), recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-03-20 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cullen, Kong, McKelvey, Todd, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee, Yamane. |
2018-03-15 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-20-18 9:00AM in conference room 325. |
2018-03-13 | House | Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 39 |
2018-03-08 | House | Offered |
2018-03-07 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR75 (Same As) 2018-05-01 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HR60 (Carry Over) 2017-03-29 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4).
HR60 (Carry Over) 2017-03-29 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=60&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HR60_.HTM |