HI SR4 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR4
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Report and Resolution Adopted, with Senator Fevella voting "No".
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Report and Resolution Adopted, with Senator Fevella voting "No".
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Hawaii State Department Of The Attorney General To Conduct A Statewide Investigation Of Sexual Abuse Of Minors In The State Of Hawaii By Clergy Of The Roman Catholic Church.
Title
Urging The Hawaii State Department Of The Attorney General To Conduct A Statewide Investigation Of Sexual Abuse Of Minors In The State Of Hawaii By Clergy Of The Roman Catholic Church.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-12 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, with Senator Fevella voting "No". |
2019-04-11 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-12-19. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2085) with recommendation of adoption. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Taniguchi. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-01-19 10:20AM in conference room 211. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from HMS/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 905), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Gabbard. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, K. Rhoads, Ihara, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS/JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-20-19 3:00PM in conference room 016. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to HMS/JDC, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR4 (Carry Over) 2019-04-12 - Report and Resolution Adopted, with Senator Fevella voting "No".
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=4&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SR4_.HTM |