HI SR36 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-25 - Report adopted, referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-25 - Report adopted, referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Law Enforcement, Fire Departments And Police Departments Of Each County, Humane Societies In Each County, And Media Organizations Throughout The State To Collaborate To Create And Disseminate Public Service Announcements To Highlight The Dangers Of, And Advocate Against The Use Of, Illegal Fireworks In Order To Protect The Health And Safety Of The Community, Pets, And Wildlife.
Title
Urging The Department Of Law Enforcement, Fire Departments And Police Departments Of Each County, Humane Societies In Each County, And Media Organizations Throughout The State To Collaborate To Create And Disseminate Public Service Announcements To Highlight The Dangers Of, And Advocate Against The Use Of, Illegal Fireworks In Order To Protect The Health And Safety Of The Community, Pets, And Wildlife.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-20 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-25 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to JDC. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3353), with recommendation of referral to JDC. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Elefante, Fukunaga, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa. |
2024-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-24 3:01PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR41 (Same As) 2024-03-25 - Resolution adopted in final form.
SCR48 (Same As) 2024-03-25 - Report adopted, referred to JDC.
SCR48 (Same As) 2024-03-25 - Report adopted, referred to JDC.