HI SR33 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SR33
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-14 - Referred to GVO.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-14 - Referred to GVO.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting Studies On Indirect And Overhead Cost Reimbursements And Timeliness Of Payments To Nonprofit Health And Human Service Providers Contracted By The Government.
Title
Requesting Studies On Indirect And Overhead Cost Reimbursements And Timeliness Of Payments To Nonprofit Health And Human Service Providers Contracted By The Government.
Sponsors
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-14 | Senate | Referred to GVO. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR33 (Carry Over) 2017-05-30 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17.
HR49 (Same As) 2018-03-28 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
HR49 (Same As) 2018-03-28 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=33&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SR33_.HTM |