HI SR33 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR33
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Office Of Hawaiian Affairs To Convene A Task Force Of Hawaiian Leaders, Legal Scholars, And A Broad Representation Of Members Of The Hawaiian Community To Review And Consider Whether Its Fiduciary Duty To Better The Conditions Of Hawaiians And Manage Its Resources To Meet The Needs Of Hawaiian Beneficiaries Would Be Better Served By Having Trustees Appointed Rather Than Elected.
Title
Requesting The Office Of Hawaiian Affairs To Convene A Task Force Of Hawaiian Leaders, Legal Scholars, And A Broad Representation Of Members Of The Hawaiian Community To Review And Consider Whether Its Fiduciary Duty To Better The Conditions Of Hawaiians And Manage Its Resources To Meet The Needs Of Hawaiian Beneficiaries Would Be Better Served By Having Trustees Appointed Rather Than Elected.
Sponsors
Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] | Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-30 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1445) with recommendation of adoption. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-17 9:45AM in conference room 211. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1208), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HWN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Galuteria, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Kim. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-17 3:00PM in conference room 016. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Referred to HWN, WAM. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR33 (Carry Over) 2017-05-30 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17.
HR56 (Same As) 2017-03-13 - Referred to OMH, JUD, referral sheet 29
HR56 (Same As) 2017-03-13 - Referred to OMH, JUD, referral sheet 29
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=33&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/SR33_.HTM |