HI SR17 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-07 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 2).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-07 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 2).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Encouraging The Hawaii Tourism Authority And Department Of Land And Natural Resources To Work With Community Organizations To Assist In The Establishment Of Historical Markers And Trails.
Title
Hawaii Tourism Authority; Department of Land and Natural Resources; Historical Trails and Walking Tours; Cultural Heritage Tourism
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-07 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 2). |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3375) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 2). |
2016-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Taniguchi, Wakai. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-24-16 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Reported from TSI/HEA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2930), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2016-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on HEA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HEA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, K.Kahele, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Slom. |
2016-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on TSI recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TSI were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) English, Galuteria, Green, K.Kahele; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Kim, Tokuda, Slom. |
2016-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on TSI/HEA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-16 3:00PM in conference room 225. |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Referred to TSI/HEA, WAM. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Offered. |