HI SR139 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SR139
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Drug Policy Forum Of Hawaii To Study How Social Equity Has Been Implemented In The Cannabis Industry Around The Nation And Ways Social Equity Could Be Implemented In The State Of Hawaii To Benefit Native Hawaiians And Other Victims Of The War On Drugs, And Directing The Department Of Health's Office Of Medical Cannabis Control And Regulation To Study How To Include The Existing Legal Growers And Hemp Licensees, Including Native Hawaiians And Those On Hawaiian Home Lands, To Be Eligible To Test And Sell Cannabis And Hemp Directly To Other Patients, And To Licensed Dispensaries.
Title
Requesting The Drug Policy Forum Of Hawaii To Study How Social Equity Has Been Implemented In The Cannabis Industry Around The Nation And Ways Social Equity Could Be Implemented In The State Of Hawaii To Benefit Native Hawaiians And Other Victims Of The War On Drugs, And Directing The Department Of Health's Office Of Medical Cannabis Control And Regulation To Study How To Include The Existing Legal Growers And Hemp Licensees, Including Native Hawaiians And Those On Hawaiian Home Lands, To Be Eligible To Test And Sell Cannabis And Hemp Directly To Other Patients, And To Licensed Dispensaries.
Sponsors
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Bennette Misalucha [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] |
Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-12 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-06 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22. |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-04-20 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-21-22. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 4022) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-04-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Keohokalole, Acasio; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Fevella. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 04-12-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference (Proposed Draft). |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Re-Referred to HWN. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Re-Referred to HWN/HTH. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred to HWN/GVO. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR139 (Carry Over) 2021-03-16 - Referred to TRS/GVO.
SCR238 (Same As) 2022-03-16 - Referred to HWN/GVO.
SCR238 (Same As) 2022-03-16 - Referred to HWN/GVO.