HI SR136 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Business, Economic Development, And Tourism, In Consultation With The Hawaii Community Development Authority, To Partner With The United States Department Of Energy To Establish An Office Of Science National Laboratory In The Kalaeloa Community Development District.
Title
Urging The Department Of Business, Economic Development, And Tourism, In Consultation With The Hawaii Community Development Authority, To Partner With The United States Department Of Energy To Establish An Office Of Science National Laboratory In The Kalaeloa Community Development District.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-05 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-04-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-05-18. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Reported from TRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3388) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Espero, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE has scheduled a public hearing on 04-02-18 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | The committee on TRE deferred the measure. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-18 2:15PM in conference room 225. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Referred to TRE. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Offered. |
Subjects
Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism
Kalaeloa Community District
Office of National Science Laboratory
United States Department of Energy
Kalaeloa Community District
Office of National Science Laboratory
United States Department of Energy