HI SR130 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SR130
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-08 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-08 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Hawaiian Homes Commission To Improve Access To Hawaiian Home Lands And Other Trust Assets To Its Native Hawaiian Beneficiaries.
Title
Urging The Hawaiian Homes Commission To Improve Access To Hawaiian Home Lands And Other Trust Assets To Its Native Hawaiian Beneficiaries.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-30 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-08 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2020-07-08 | Senate | Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3825) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2020-06-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, K. Kahele, Ihara, J.Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-06-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN deferred the measure until 06-30-20 12:31PM in conference room 016. |
2020-06-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 06-25-20 12:32PM in conference room 016. |
2020-03-16 | Senate | The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-20 2:15PM in conference room 016. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Referred to HWN. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR130 (Carry Over) 2019-03-25 - The committee on WTL deferred the measure.