HI SR13 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-24 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-24 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Board Of Regents Of The University Of Hawaii Not To Raise Student Fees To Balance The Budget Of The University Of Hawaii Athletics Department Or Budget Deficit Of Any Other Department Of The University Of Hawaii.
Title
University of Hawaii; Athletics Department; Student Fees
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3084), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HRE were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kidani, Tokuda ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ige. |
2014-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-14 2:45PM in conference room 414. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Referred to HRE, WAM. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=13&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/bills/SR13_.HTM |