HI SR126 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-31 - Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-31 - Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The State Foundation On Culture And The Arts To Convene A Task Force To Develop Art, Branding, And Narratives For An Appropriate Selection Of Hawaii's Unique Communities, Landmarks, Parks, And Other Similar Areas.
Title
Urging The State Foundation On Culture And The Arts To Convene A Task Force To Develop Art, Branding, And Narratives For An Appropriate Selection Of Hawaii's Unique Communities, Landmarks, Parks, And Other Similar Areas.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-31 | Senate | Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24 |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2024-04-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-24. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Reported from TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3511) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2024-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Elefante, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Awa. |
2024-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-24 3:02PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Referred to TCA. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR148 (Same As) 2024-04-05 - Referred to CAI, FIN, referral sheet 27
Subjects
Branding
Communities
Division of Business Development and Support
Division of State Parks
Landmarks
Parks
State Foundation on the Culture and the Arts
University of Hawaii Community Design Center
Communities
Division of Business Development and Support
Division of State Parks
Landmarks
Parks
State Foundation on the Culture and the Arts
University of Hawaii Community Design Center