HI SR126 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR126
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Re-Referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Re-Referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Education To Provide Each Of Its Schools With Two Flagpoles So That The United States Flag And Hawaii State Flag May Be Flown At The Same Height.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Education To Provide Each Of Its Schools With Two Flagpoles So That The United States Flag And Hawaii State Flag May Be Flown At The Same Height.
Sponsors
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] |
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | Senate | Re-Referred to WAM. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR126 (Carry Over) 2019-03-27 - Re-Referred to WAM.
HR155 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 33
HR155 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 33
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=126&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SR126_.HTM |