HI SR12 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SR12
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting That The Governor Create A Citizen Advisory Council On Federal Affairs.
Title
Requesting That The Governor Create A Citizen Advisory Council On Federal Affairs.
Sponsors
Sen. Bennette Misalucha [D] | Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-06 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. |
2022-04-01 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-22. |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3585) with recommendation of adoption. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Baker, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-29-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Referred to PSM. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR12 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
HR91 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 27
SCR18 (Same As) 2022-04-04 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 44
HR91 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 27
SCR18 (Same As) 2022-04-04 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 44