HI SR115 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SR115
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Education To Develop A Filipino History, Culture, And Identity Social Studies Course For High School Students.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Education To Develop A Filipino History, Culture, And Identity Social Studies Course For High School Students.
Sponsors
Sen. Bennette Misalucha [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] |
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-06 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-03-30 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-31-22. |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3547) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Kanuha. |
2022-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-22 3:15PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred to EDU. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR115 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
HR50 (Same As) 2022-04-07 - Resolution adopted in final form.
SCR131 (Same As) 2022-04-19 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JHA as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashimoto, McKelvey, Ward excused (3).
HR50 (Same As) 2022-04-07 - Resolution adopted in final form.
SCR131 (Same As) 2022-04-19 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JHA as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashimoto, McKelvey, Ward excused (3).