HI SR115 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR115
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting That The United States Congress Pass A Law That Criminalizes Any Act By A Current Or Former Law Enforcement Officer, Military Personnel, Or Politician That Is Contrary To Their Oath To Uphold The Constitution.
Title
Requesting That The United States Congress Pass A Law That Criminalizes Any Act By A Current Or Former Law Enforcement Officer, Military Personnel, Or Politician That Is Contrary To Their Oath To Uphold The Constitution.
Sponsors
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-21 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted as amended (SD 1). Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim. Noes, 3 (Senator(s) Fevella, Keohokalole, Riviere). |
2021-03-30 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-31-21. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1469) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fevella; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-21 9:45AM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR115 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
SCR149 (Same As) 2021-04-01 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 32
SCR149 (Same As) 2021-04-01 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 32