HI SCR99 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR99
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-07 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JHA as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-07 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JHA as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Ratifying A Proposed Amendment To The Constitution Of The United States Giving The Congress Of The United States Power To Limit, Regulate, And Prohibit The Labor Of Persons Under Eighteen Years Of Age.
Title
Ratifying A Proposed Amendment To The Constitution Of The United States Giving The Congress Of The United States Power To Limit, Regulate, And Prohibit The Labor Of Persons Under Eighteen Years Of Age.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - House - House Labor & Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JHA as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2021-04-07 | House | Reported from LAT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1646) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to JHA. |
2021-04-06 | House | The committees on LAT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Onishi, Sayama, Holt, D. Kobayashi, Takayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Quinlan. |
2021-04-01 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by LAT on Tuesday, 04-06-21 10:00AM in conference room 312 Via Videoconference. |
2021-04-01 | House | Referred to LAT, JHA, referral sheet 32 |
2021-03-31 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 520) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted as amended (SD 1). Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) San Buenaventura. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-31-21. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1462) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-29-21 9:45AM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR99 (Carry Over) 2021-04-07 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JHA as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).