HI SCR90 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR90
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting A Study Of Potential Projects That Would Reduce Energy Costs For All State Departments And Agencies.
Title
Requesting A Study Of Potential Projects That Would Reduce Energy Costs For All State Departments And Agencies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Reported from TRE/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3305), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Ruderman, Galuteria, Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Espero, English; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Shimabukuro. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-18 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Referred to TRE/GVO, WAM. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR90 (Carry Over) 2017-04-07 - Referred to AGR/EDB, FIN, referral sheet 41
HCR123 (Same As) 2018-05-01 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HCR123 (Same As) 2018-05-01 - Resolution adopted in final form.